01/18/2012 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
01/10/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |||
05/03/2011 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/26/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |