08/08/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 191, Statutes of 2011. | |||
08/08/2011 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/25/2011 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |||
07/14/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/14/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1847.). | |||
06/09/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/08/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 8). | |||
06/06/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/12/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |||
04/25/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/25/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 1040.) | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 12). | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |