|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 693, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 2567.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 2014.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 1512.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|