California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1346 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/18/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1346INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Atkins FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend Section 3099 of the Labor Code, relating to employment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1346, as introduced, Atkins. Division of Apprenticeship Standards: certification of electricians. Existing law requires the Division of Apprenticeship Standards in the Department of Industrial Relations to establish standards for certification of electricians, as defined, and requires the division to establish an advisory committee and panels as necessary. Existing law also requires the division to establish an electrical certification curriculum committee. The committee must establish standards for enrollees of specified training programs. If an educational provider's curriculum meets those standards, the committee must designate that curriculum as approved. The approved curriculum is subject to the committee's review, and the committee may withdraw its approval if the educational provider does not continue to meet those standards. The committee must require a designated provider to submit an annual notice stating whether the provider continues to offer the approved curriculum and whether material changes have been made to the curriculum since its approval. Existing law forbids discrimination for or against any person based on membership or nonmembership in a union. This bill would make nonsubstantive changes to those provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 3099 of the Labor Code is amended to read: 3099. (a) The Division of Apprenticeship Standards shall do all of the following: (1) On or before July 1, 2001, establish and validate minimum standards for the competency and training of electricians through a system of testing and certification. (2) On or before March 1, 2000, establish an advisory committee and panels as necessary to carry out the functions under this section. There shall be contractor representation from both joint apprenticeship programs and unilateral nonunion programs in the electrical contracting industry. (3) On or before July 1, 2001, establish fees necessary to implement this section. (4) On or before July 1, 2001, establish and adopt regulations to enforce this section. (5) Issue certification cards to electricians who have been certified pursuant to this section. Fees collected pursuant to paragraph (3) are continuously appropriated in an amount sufficient to pay the costs of issuing certification cards, and that amount may be expended for that purpose by the division. (6) On or before July 1, 2003, establish an electrical certification curriculum committee comprised of representatives of the State Department of Education, the California Community Colleges, and the division. The  following shall apply to the  electrical certification curriculum committee  shall do all of the following  : (A)  Establish   The committee shall establish  written educational curriculum standards for enrollees in training programs established pursuant to Section 3099.4. (B) If an educational provider's curriculum meets the written educational curriculum standards established in accordance with subparagraph (A),  the committee shall  designate that curriculum as an approved curriculum of classroom instruction. (C)  At the committee's discretion,   The   committee may  review the approved curriculum of classroom instruction of any designated educational provider. The committee may withdraw its approval of the curriculum if the educational provider does not continue to meet the established written educational curriculum standards. (D)  Require   The committee shall require  each designated educational provider to submit an annual notice to the committee stating whether the educational provider is continuing to offer the approved curriculum of classroom instruction and whether any material changes have been made to the curriculum since its approval. (b) There shall be no discrimination for or against any person based on membership or nonmembership in a union. (c) As used in this section, "electricians" includes all persons who engage in the connection of electrical devices for electrical contractors licensed pursuant to Section 7058 of the Business and Professions Code, specifically, contractors classified as electrical contractors in the Contractors' State License Board Rules and Regulations. This section does not apply to electrical connections under 100 volt-amperes. This section does not apply to persons performing work to which Section 7042.5 of the Business and Professions Code is applicable, or to electrical work ordinarily and customarily performed by stationary engineers. This section does not apply to electrical work in connection with the installation, operation, or maintenance of temporary or portable electrical equipment performed by technicians in the theatrical, motion picture production, television, hotel, exhibition, or trade show industries.