|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 2684.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1916.).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1452.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|