|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2924.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2203.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1555.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|