California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill March 25, 2011