|
06/20/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 20. Noes 12. Page 1474.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 6. Page 1559.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (received May 6 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2))
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|