|
10/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 454, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2304.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1817.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|