02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/19/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | |||
01/17/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
01/13/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
01/12/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 10). | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |