LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1379
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1379
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1379
Compare Versions
AB1379 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB1379 Amended September 1, 2011
AB1379 Amended August 30, 2011
AB1379 Amended August 15, 2011
AB1379 Amended June 23, 2011
AB1379 Amended June 21, 2011
AB1379 Amended May 27, 2011
AB1379 Amended March 14, 2011
AB1379 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1379 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB1379 Amended September 1, 2011
AB1379 Amended August 30, 2011
AB1379 Amended August 15, 2011
AB1379 Amended June 23, 2011
AB1379 Amended June 21, 2011
AB1379 Amended May 27, 2011
AB1379 Amended March 14, 2011
AB1379 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare