California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB138 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill June 15, 2011