California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2011

Amended

Bill June 29, 2011
Bill June 2, 2011
Bill March 21, 2011