California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1386 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2011

Amended

Bill June 13, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011