California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2011

Chaptered

Bill August 31, 2011

Amended

Bill August 15, 2011
Bill May 17, 2011