LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1398
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1398
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1398
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 28, 2011
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 20, 2011
Compare
Bill
August 19, 2011
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 6, 2011
Compare
Amended
Bill
September 2, 2011
Compare
Bill
July 7, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 31, 2011
Compare