|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 557, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2568.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2010.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 11).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1559.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 2.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|