|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3141.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2389.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (September 7). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1466.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 7.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|