|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 410, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2969.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1407.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 6).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1863.).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1436.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 7.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|