|
09/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 2011.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 1500.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 9.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|