|
08/05/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 181, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1864.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 981.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|