LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1411
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1411
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1411
Compare Versions
AB1411 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1411 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1411 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1411 Amended August 15, 2011
AB1411 Amended July 12, 2011
AB1411 Amended June 28, 2011
AB1411 Introduced March 10, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1411 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1411 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1411 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1411 Amended August 15, 2011
AB1411 Amended July 12, 2011
AB1411 Amended June 28, 2011
AB1411 Introduced March 10, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare