|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2388.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Pavley.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1689.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1353.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|