|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2410.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1566.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|