08/30/2012 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton. | |||
08/21/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/20/2012 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |||
09/08/2011 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Calderon. | |||
08/24/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |||
07/11/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/20/2011 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/15/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/14/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/23/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/23/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1501.) | |||
05/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |||
03/22/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 21. | |||
03/21/2011 | Read first time. To print. |