California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1422 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/09/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1422CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 74 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 9, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 9, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 5, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 5, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 14, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 1, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Perea (Coauthor: Assembly Member Conway) (Coauthors: Senators Fuller and Rubio) MARCH 22, 2011 An act to amend Sections 2 and 3 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2009, Seventh Extraordinary Session, to amend Section 9 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010, and to amend Section 2 of Chapter 226 of the Statutes of 2010, relating to elections, an act calling an election, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1422, Perea. Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012: submission to voters. Existing law creates the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012, which, if approved by the voters, would authorize the issuance of bonds in the amount of $11,140,000,000 pursuant to the State General Obligation Bond Law to finance a safe drinking water and water supply reliability program. Existing law provides for the submission of the bond act to the voters at the November 6, 2012, statewide general election. This bill would instead provide for the submission of the bond act to the voters at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election. This bill would declare that it is to take immediate effect as an urgency statute and an act calling an election. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2009, Seventh Extraordinary Session, as amended by Section 7 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010, is amended to read: Sec. 2. Section 1 of this act shall be submitted to the voters at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election, instead of the November 6, 2012, statewide general election, in accordance with provisions of the Government Code and the Elections Code governing the submission of a statewide measure to the voters. SEC. 2. Section 3 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2009, Seventh Extraordinary Session, as amended by Section 8 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010, is amended to read: Sec. 3. Section 1 of this act shall take effect only upon the approval by the voters of the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012, as set forth in that section at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election. SEC. 3. Section 9 of Chapter 126 of the Statutes of 2010 is amended to read: Sec. 9. The Secretary of State shall submit the heading of Division 26.7 (commencing with Section 79700) of, and Sections 79700, 79702, 79716, 79749, and 79749.5 of, the Water Code, as amended by Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, of this act, in place of the heading of Division 26.7 (commencing with Section 79700) of, and Sections 79700, 79702, 79716, 79749, and 79749.5 of, the Water Code, as added by Section 1 of Chapter 3 of the Seventh Extraordinary Session of the Statutes of 2009, in order that they are voted upon as part of the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012, at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election. SEC. 4. Section 2 of Chapter 226 of the Statutes of 2010 is amended to read: Sec. 2. The Secretary of State shall submit Section 79770 of the Water Code, as amended by Section 1 of this act, in place of Section 79770 of the Water Code, as added by Section 1 of Chapter 3 of the Seventh Extraordinary Session of the Statutes of 2009, in order that it is voted upon as part of the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012 at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election. SEC. 5. This act calls an election within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. SEC. 6. This act is an urgency statute necessary for the immediate preservation of the public peace, health, or safety within the meaning of Article IV of the Constitution and shall go into immediate effect. The facts constituting the necessity are: In order to ensure that the Safe, Clean, and Reliable Drinking Water Supply Act of 2012 is submitted to the voters at the November 4, 2014, statewide general election, it is necessary that this act take effect immediately.