|
10/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 3189.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3059.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (September 8).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 2364.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1566.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|