|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 806, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 6099.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 4582.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 4912.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4875.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|