|
09/30/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 6635.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6487.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 4908.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Held in committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 1855.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1691.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|