|
08/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5755.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4180.).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4345.)
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|