|
08/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 185, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 4437.).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 4246.)
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|