|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 854, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 6533.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4892.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 4822.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|