|
09/28/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6629.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4952.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 22. Page 4486.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
|
|
|
|
01/09/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|