California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1456 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012