LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1457
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1457
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1457
Action History
04/18/2012
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
04/09/2012
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
03/29/2012
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 26).
01/26/2012
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
01/10/2012
From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
01/09/2012
Read first time. To print.