|
07/05/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4280.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4567.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
|
|
|
|
01/09/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|