California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1458 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 07/17/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1458CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 138 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 17, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 17, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 5, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 5, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Buchanan and Achadjian JANUARY 9, 2012 An act to add Section 14534.1 to the Government Code, relating to the California Transportation Commission. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1458, Buchanan. California Transportation Commission. Existing law establishes in state government the California Transportation Commission with specified powers, duties, and functions relative to transportation matters. The Governor's Reorganization Plan No. 2 of 2012 (GRP 2) proposes to establish the Transportation Agency, which would include various departments and state entities, including the commission. GRP 2 is proposed to become operative on July 1, 2013, if not disapproved by the Legislature in accordance with specified procedures. This bill would provide that the commission retain independent authority to perform its powers, duties, and functions. The bill would provide that the above-described provisions would become operative on July 1, 2013, and only if GRP 2 takes effect. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14534.1 is added to the Government Code, to read: 14534.1. Notwithstanding Section 12850.6 or subdivision (b) of Section 12800, as added to this code by the Governor's Reorganization Plan No. 2 of 2012 during the 2011-12 Regular Session, the commission shall retain independent authority to perform those duties and functions prescribed to it under this part. SEC. 2. (a) Section 1 of this act shall become operative only if the Governor's Reorganization Plan No. 2 of 2012 becomes effective. (b) Except as otherwise provided in subdivision (a), Section 1 of this act shall become operative on July 1, 2013. (c) Section 1 of this act shall prevail over any provision of the Governor's Reorganization Plan No. 2 of 2012, regardless of the dates on which this act and that plan take effect.