|
08/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 186, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5838.).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4317.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4568.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
|
|
|
|
01/09/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|