California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1459 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 08/27/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1459CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 186 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 27, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 27, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 6, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 9, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 18, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Huber JANUARY 9, 2012 An act to repeal Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 39900) of Part 2 of Division 26 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1459, Huber. The Atmospheric Acidity Protection Act of 1988. Existing law, the Atmospheric Acidity Protection Act of 1988, establishes the Scientific Advisory Committee on Acid Deposition to assist the State Air Resources Board in the development and implementation of the Atmospheric Acidity Protection Program. This bill would repeal that act. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 39900) of Part 2 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code is repealed.