|
08/30/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4926.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
From committee: That the measure be returned with further amendments to the Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (August 23). Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 4088.)
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|