06/27/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (June 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 18. Page 4141.). | |||
06/26/2012 | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/25/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |||
06/07/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |||
04/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
03/22/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 4092.) | |||
03/19/2012 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
01/11/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |||
01/10/2012 | Read first time. To print. |