|
02/01/2012
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on J., E.D. & E. and B., P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|