|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 5102.).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|