|
09/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 498, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4742.).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4888.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|