05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/10/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). | |||
04/16/2012 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/11/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
01/17/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. | |||
01/13/2012 | Read first time. To print. |