08/27/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/24/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
08/20/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/16/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |||
08/06/2012 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5100.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
03/28/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/22/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
01/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
01/17/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. | |||
01/13/2012 | Read first time. To print. |