|
08/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4445.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4568.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|