|
06/15/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3766.).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 7. Page 4246.)
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|