|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 632, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6677.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4929.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 4893.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4547.) From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
In committee: Reconsideration granted. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|