|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 700, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 31. Page 6503.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 4873.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 4661.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 27).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|